Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-François Mathieu Arrighi

Deceased

Vice President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Family

Titular Bishop of Vico Equense


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1918Born
28 Jun 194729.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Ajaccio, France
27 Mar 194829.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ajaccio, France
17 Apr 198566.9AppointedVice President of the Pontifical Council for the Family
17 Apr 198566.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Vico Equense
9 Jun 198567.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Vico Equense
5 Nov 199274.5RetiredVice President of the Pontifical Council for the Family
1 Dec 199880.5DiedVice President Emeritus of the Pontifical Council for the Family

MicroData Summary for Jean-François Mathieu Arrighi (VIAF: 165654957)
Bishop Jean-François Mathieu Arrighi (born , died ) Vice President Emeritus of Family

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVico, Diocese of Ajaccio, France
Ordained DeaconSaint-Joseph des Carmes of Catholic Institute, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopSanta Maria sopra la Minerva, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Vico, Diocese of Ajaccio, France

  • a priest for 50.6 years
  • a bishop for 13.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c1: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • od/c0/loc: AJ, 17 Jul 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 19 Jul 2018

Quantcast