Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul-Marie-André Cardinal Richaud

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Apr 1887BornVersailles
28 Jun 191326.1Ordained PriestPriest of Versailles, France
21 Dec 193346.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Versailles, France
21 Dec 193346.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Isauria
25 Jan 193446.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Isauria
27 Jul 193851.2AppointedBishop of Laval, France
10 Feb 195062.8AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France
15 Dec 195871.6Elevated to Cardinal
15 Dec 195871.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Quirico e Giulitta
5 Feb 196880.8DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas), France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Marie-André Richaud:
Paul-Marie-André Cardinal Richaud (born , died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux (-Bazas)

  • a priest for 54.6 years
  • a bishop for 34.0 years
  • a cardinal for 9.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015