Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-Marie Cazaux

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luçon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1897BornPouillon
29 Jun 192225.0Ordained PriestPriest
11 Oct 194144.3AppointedBishop of Luçon, France
8 Dec 194144.4Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
4 Jul 196770.0ResignedBishop of Luçon, France
4 Jul 196770.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Thubunae in Numidia
10 Dec 197073.4ResignedTitular Bishop of Thubunae in Numidia
1 Jul 197578.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-Marie Cazaux:
Bishop Antoine-Marie Cazaux (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luçon

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 33.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1941, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015