Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Lancellotti

Deceased

Bishop of Conversano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Oct 1858BornMontegallo
29 Apr 190950.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Delcus
3 May 190950.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Delcus
21 Apr 191152.5AppointedBishop of Troia, Italy
14 Mar 191859.4AppointedBishop of Conversano, Italy
9 Jun 1930³71.6DiedBishop of Conversano, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Lancellotti:
Bishop Domenico Lancellotti (born , died ) Bishop of Conversano

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1931
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013