Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas O’Gorman

Deceased

Bishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 May 1843Born
5 Nov 186522.5Ordained PriestPriest of Saint Paul, Minnesota, USA
24 Jan 189652.7AppointedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
19 Apr 189652.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA
18 Sep 192178.3DiedBishop of Sioux Falls, South Dakota, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas O’Gorman (VIAF: 47142895)
Bishop Thomas O’Gorman (born , died ) Bishop of Sioux Falls

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBoston, MA, Diocese of Boston, Massachusetts
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Church, Washington, DC
Death PlaceSioux Falls, Diocese of Sioux Falls, South Dakota

  • a priest for 55.8 years
  • a bishop for 25.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 521
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017