Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Cirielli

Deceased

Prelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

Titular Bishop of Proconnesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Apr 1836BornAcquaviva delle Fonti
18 Dec 185822.7Ordained PriestPriest
12 Mar 189962.9AppointedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy
19 Jun 189963.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
2 Jul 189963.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
1902¹65.7DiedPrelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Cirielli:
Bishop Tommaso Cirielli (born ) Prelate of Altamura ed Acquaviva delle Fonti

  • a priest for 43.0 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 470

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013