Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Valbonesi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

Titular Bishop of Memphis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1868Born
16 Nov 189022.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jun 189931.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Albano, Italy
13 Jun 189931.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Argos
2 Jul 189931.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Argos
15 Apr 190132.9AppointedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
4 May 190637.9ResignedBishop of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy
4 May 190637.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Memphis
5 Jan 193465.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Valbonesi (VIAF: 89480224)
Bishop Antonio Valbonesi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Urbania e Sant’Angelo in Vado

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLadino, Diocese of Forli
Ordained BishopSoeurs du Precieux Sang, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 43.1 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1935
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 102, and Page 120
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 34

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017