Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henrico Gratiani

Deceased

Bishop of Sarsina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1833Born
20 Sep 186228.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
20 Dec 186229.1Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189258.7AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
17 Jul 189258.7Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
9 Oct 189763.9DiedBishop of Sarsina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Henrico Gratiani
Bishop Henrico Gratiani (born , died ) Bishop of Sarsina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCotignola, Diocese of Faenza
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 503
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1892, Number 41

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 May 2017