Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Augustin Marre, O.C.S.O. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Reims

Titular Archbishop of Melitene


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1853BornGoutrens, France
25 Mar 187622.4ProfessedMember of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
18 Nov 187724.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
22 May 187925.5Solemn ProfessedPriest of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
11 Aug 190046.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
11 Aug 190046.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
19 Aug 190046.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia
8 Oct 190450.9AppointedAbbot Primate of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
18 Sep 192268.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
18 Sep 192268.8ResignedAbbot Primate of Order of Cistercians of the Strict Observance
16 Aug 192369.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Melitene
7 Sep 192773.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Reims, France

MicroData Summary for Augustin Marre:
Archbishop Augustin Marre O.C.S.O. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Reims

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 223

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013