Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alfonso Archi

Deceased

Bishop of Cesena, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Nov 1864Born
13 Jul 190136.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Comacchio, Italy
13 Jul 190136.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Gaza
19 Jul 190136.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gaza
10 Oct 190237.8AppointedBishop of Comacchio, Italy
8 Sep 190540.8AppointedBishop of Como, Italy
16 Nov 192560.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Dara
4 Mar 192762.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Cesena, Italy
4 Dec 193874.0DiedBishop of Cesena, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Archi
Archbishop Alfonso Archi (born , died ) Bishop of Cesena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFaenza

  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1939
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 217, and Page 283
  • c2: CB, 7 May 2012
  • b/c2: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast