Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Franz Zorn von Bulach

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

Titular Bishop of Erythrum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1858BornStrasbourg
10 Aug 189132.7Ordained PriestPriest of Strasbourg, France
24 Oct 190142.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
24 Oct 190142.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Erythrum
3 Nov 190143.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Erythrum
1919²60.1ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Strasbourg, France
13 Jan 192566.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Franz Zorn von Bulach:
Bishop Franz Zorn von Bulach (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Strasbourg

  • a priest for 33.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 262
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013