Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Letterio D’Arrigo Ramondini

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1849Born
21 Sep 187222.8Ordained PriestPriest of Messina, Italy
24 Mar 189848.3AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
25 Mar 189848.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Messina, Italy
17 Dec 192273.0DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Letterio D’Arrigo Ramondini (VIAF: 89548674)
Archbishop Letterio D’Arrigo Ramondini (born , died ) Archbishop of Messina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessina, Archdiocese of Messina
Ordained BishopSacro Cuore di Gesù a Castro Pretorio, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: JPG
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 380
  • c2+: CB, 7 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,063
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1898, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017