Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele Sandrelli

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

Titular Bishop of Comana Armeniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1834BornS. Martino Vitiano
19 Sep 185722.8Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 189257.6AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
17 Jul 189257.6Ordained BishopBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
3 Jul 191176.5RetiredBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
3 Jul 191176.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Comana Armeniae
27 Nov 191277.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele Sandrelli:
Bishop Raffaele Sandrelli (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro)

  • a priest for 55.2 years
  • a bishop for 20.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013