Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pasquale Berardi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta

Titular Archbishop of Nacolia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 May 1861BornDuronia
19 Jul 188524.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Mar 189836.9AppointedBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
25 Mar 189836.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ruvo e Bitonto, Italy
21 Apr 192159.9AppointedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
9 May 192564.0ResignedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
9 May 192564.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nacolia
23 Jul 194685.2DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pasquale Berardi:
Archbishop Pasquale Berardi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 48.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 487
  • c2: CB, 7 May 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,230
  • ob/c2+: CB, 5 Jun 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 101
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Number 17,756

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013