Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Brindle

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Tacapae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1837Born
27 Dec 186225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
31 Jan 189961.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Westminster, England, Great Britain
31 Jan 189961.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
12 Mar 189961.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hermopolis Maior
6 Dec 190164.0AppointedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
2 Jan 190264.1InstalledBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
1 Jun 191577.5ResignedBishop of Nottingham, England, Great Britain
1 Jun 191577.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Tacapae
27 Jun 191678.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Nottingham, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Robert Brindle
Bishop Robert Brindle (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nottingham

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLiverpool, Diocese of Liverpool, England
Ordained BishopS. Gregoire au Coelius, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 304, and Page 418
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 44
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1899, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jun 2017