Catholic-Hierarchy DC

William Henry Cardinal O’Connell

Deceased

Archbishop of Boston, Massachusetts

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1859BornLowell, MA
7 Jun 188424.5Ordained PriestPriest of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
1895²35.1AppointedRector of the Pontifical North American College
14 May 190141.4AppointedBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
19 May 190141.4Ordained BishopBishop of Portland, Maine, USA
7 Feb 190646.2AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
7 Feb 190646.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Constantina
30 Aug 190747.7SucceededArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA
27 Nov 191152.0Elevated to Cardinal
30 Nov 191152.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
22 Apr 194484.4DiedArchbishop of Boston, Massachusetts, USA

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Henry O’Connell:
Cardinal William Henry O’Connell (born , died ) Archbishop of Boston

  • a priest for 59.9 years
  • a bishop for 42.9 years
  • a cardinal for 32.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: CB, 29 Oct 2011
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 464
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 18
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 90

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013