Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Pugliatti

Deceased

Bishop of Bova


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1834BornBova
1858¹23.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bova, Italy
19 Apr 190065.7AppointedBishop of Bova, Italy
13 May 190065.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bova, Italy
20 Nov 191480.2DiedBishop of Bova, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Pugliatti:
Bishop Domenico Pugliatti (born , died ) Bishop of Bova

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 155

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013