Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Angelo Maria Cardinal Dolci

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Romania

Cardinal-Bishop of Palestrina

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jul 1867BornCivitella di Agliano
5 Jun 189022.9Ordained PriestPriest
19 Apr 190032.8AppointedBishop of Gubbio, Italy
13 May 190032.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gubbio, Italy
7 Dec 190639.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
7 Dec 190639.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
7 Dec 190639.4AppointedApostolic Delegate to Peru
9 Dec 190639.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nazianzus
Sep 191043.1ResignedApostolic Delegate to Ecuador
Sep 191043.1ResignedApostolic Delegate to Bolivia
Sep 191043.1ResignedApostolic Delegate to Peru
27 Jan 191143.5AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
10 Jun 191446.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Other
16 Nov 191447.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Hierapolis in Syria
14 Dec 192255.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Belgium
30 May 192355.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Romania
13 Mar 193365.7Elevated to Cardinal
13 Mar 193365.7ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Romania
16 Mar 193365.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Vittoria
22 May 193365.9AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
15 Jun 193668.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
13 Sep 193972.2DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Romania

MicroData Summary for Angelo Maria Dolci:
Cardinal Angelo Maria Dolci (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Romania

  • a priest for 49.3 years
  • a bishop for 39.3 years
  • a cardinal for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 265
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013