Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pier Matteo Cardinal Petrucci, C.O. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

Cardinal-Priest of San Marcello


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 May 1636BornJesi
2 Feb 166124.7ProfessedMember of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
14 Mar 166124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Confederation of Oratorians of St. Philip Neri
14 Apr 168144.9AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
20 Apr 168144.9Ordained BishopBishop of Jesi, Italy
2 Sep 168650.3Elevated to Cardinal
9 Jun 168751.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Marcello
21 Jan 169154.7ResignedBishop of Jesi, Italy
5 Jul 170165.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pier Matteo Petrucci:
Cardinal Pier Matteo Petrucci C.O. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

  • a priest for 40.3 years
  • a bishop for 20.2 years
  • a cardinal for 14.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 2 Sep 1686

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013