Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bottari, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pula (Pola)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1646BornVenetiis
4 Jul 169549.5AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
10 Jul 169549.5Ordained BishopBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
Sep 172983.7DiedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Maria Bottari:
Bishop Giuseppe Maria Bottari O.F.M. Conv. Bishop of Pula (Pola)

  • a bishop for 34.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 318

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013