Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fabrizio Maffei

Deceased

Bishop of Penne e Atri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Dec 1637BornMontepeloso
22 Dec 169861.0AppointedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
28 Dec 169861.0Ordained BishopBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy
Jun 1723³85.4DiedBishop of Penne e Atri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Fabrizio Maffei:
Bishop Fabrizio Maffei (born , died Jun 1723) Bishop of Penne e Atri

  • a bishop for 24.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 310
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015