Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Octavius Spader, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1645³BornZara
16 Mar 166923.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
28 Nov 169550.0AppointedBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
30 Nov 169550.0Ordained BishopBishop of Arbe (Rab), Croatia
19 Dec 169853.0AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
24 Mar 171569.3DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Octavius Spader:
Bishop Octavius Spader O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Assisi

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 95, and Page 101
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015