Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Epifanio Fanelli, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Aug 1652BornVenice
19 Sep 169543.0AppointedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
2 Oct 169543.0Ordained BishopBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece
Dec 1697²45.2DiedBishop of Cefalonia e Zante, Greece

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Epifanio Fanelli:
Bishop Epifanio Fanelli O.S.B. (born , died Dec 1697) Bishop of Cefalonia e Zante

  • a bishop for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 154
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015