Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Schinosi

Deceased

Bishop of Caserta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1659BornVigilien
12 Jun 168828.9Ordained PriestPriest
20 Feb 169636.6AppointedBishop of Caserta, Italy
26 Feb 169636.6Ordained BishopBishop of Caserta, Italy
17 Sep 173475.2DiedBishop of Caserta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Schinosi:
Bishop Giuseppe Schinosi (born , died ) Bishop of Caserta

  • a priest for 46.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 146

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013