Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François Amédée Milliet d’Arvillars

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1664Born
21 Dec 168622.7Ordained DeaconDeacon
9 Feb 168722.9Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jan 169934.8AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
1 Feb 169934.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
11 Jun 172763.2SelectedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
25 Jun 172763.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France
28 Aug 174480.4DiedArchbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise), France

MicroData Summary for François Amédée Milliet d’Arvillars
Archbishop François Amédée Milliet d’Arvillars (born , died ) Archbishop of Tarentaise (Moûtiers-en-Tarentaise)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChambery

  • a priest for 57.5 years
  • a bishop for 45.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 104, and Page 368
  • c34: CB, 12 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast