Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano De Andrea, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Monopoli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Sep 1630Born
15 Sep 169868.0AppointedBishop of Monopoli, Italy
21 Sep 169868.0Ordained BishopBishop of Monopoli, Italy
Jan 1702³71.2DiedBishop of Monopoli, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gaetano De Andrea
Bishop Gaetano De Andrea C.R. (born , died Jan 1702) Bishop of Monopoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRavello

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 273
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast