Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luca Trapani

Deceased

Bishop of Tricarico


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Mar 1664³BornNapoli
24 Feb 168722.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 Mar 168722.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 169834.7AppointedBishop of Ischia, Italy
28 Dec 169834.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ischia, Italy
24 Jan 171853.8AppointedBishop of Tricarico, Italy
Sep 1719³55.4DiedBishop of Tricarico, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luca Trapani:
Bishop Luca Trapani (born , died Sep 1719) Bishop of Tricarico

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 230, and Page 388
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015