Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Giacomo Altoviti

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1604¹Born
29 Jul 165854.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Athenae
11 Aug 165854.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Athenae
21 Sep 165854.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
22 Apr 166662.3ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
18 Apr 166763.2AppointedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}
18 May 169389.3DiedTitular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Altoviti (VIAF: 46905299)
Patriarch Giacomo Altoviti (born 1604, died ) Titular Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze, Archdiocese of Firenze {Florence}, Italy, Italy
Ordained BishopSan Giovanni Battista dei Fiorentini, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 34.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 86, and Page 99
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 37
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes (Karttunen), Page 230
  • ob/c2: AT, 11 Dec 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,164

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018