Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe de Carolis

Deceased

Bishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo

Titular Archbishop of Tyana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jul 1652BornPofi
5 Oct 169947.2AppointedBishop of Aquino, Italy
11 Oct 169947.2Ordained BishopBishop of Aquino, Italy
23 Jun 172572.9AppointedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy
13 Jul 172572.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyana
5 Jan 174289.4DiedBishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe de Carolis:
Archbishop Giuseppe de Carolis (born , died ) Bishop of Aquino e Pontecorvo

  • a bishop for 42.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 94, and Page 396
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1699, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015