Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Marie Sacco, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Brugnato


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1643¹BornSavona
28 Nov 169552.9AppointedBishop of Ajaccio, France
30 Nov 169552.9Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
27 Mar 169754.2AppointedBishop of Brugnato, Italy
21 Dec 172178.9DiedBishop of Brugnato, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for François Marie Sacco:
Bishop François Marie Sacco C.R. (born 1643, died ) Bishop of Brugnato

  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 68, and Page 128
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 2 May 2015