Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso d’Aquino, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vico Equense, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1657Born
21 Jun 170042.7AppointedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
24 Jun 170042.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vico Equense, Italy
15 Oct 173275.0DiedBishop of Vico Equense, Italy

MicroData Summary for Tommaso d’Aquino
Bishop Tommaso d’Aquino C.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Vico Equense

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaramanico

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 413
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast