Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Niccol˛ Cardinal Albergati-Ludovisi

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1608BornBologna
6 Feb 164536.3AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
26 Feb 164536.4Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
6 Mar 164536.4Elevated to Cardinal
24 Apr 164536.6InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Agostino
25 Jun 164637.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria degli Angeli
11 Dec 165143.2ResignedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
11 Oct 166658.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
19 Oct 167668.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
13 Sep 167768.9AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Sabina
1 Dec 168173.2AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
15 Feb 168374.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
9 Aug 168778.9DiedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Niccol˛ Albergati-Ludovisi:
Niccol˛ Cardinal Albergati-Ludovisi (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

  • a bishop for 42.4 years
  • a cardinal for 42.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1645
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 28, and Page 118
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1645, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 20 Apr 2015