Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Gallo Vandeinde

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Capri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1661³BornNapoli
17 Dec 168928.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
11 Mar 169029.1Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 169837.6AppointedBishop of Capri, Italy
21 Sep 169837.7Ordained BishopBishop of Capri, Italy
18 Dec 172766.9ResignedBishop of Capri, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Gallo Vandeinde:
Bishop Michele Gallo Vandeinde (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Capri

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 140
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015