Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Placido Scoppa (Stoppa), C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Venosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1640BornMessina
11 May 165918.5ProfessedMember of Congregation of Clerics Regular
12 Oct 166424.0Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Clerics Regular
8 Jun 169352.6AppointedArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
14 Jun 169352.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Dubrovnik (Ragusa), Croatia
11 Apr 169958.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Venosa, Italy
Dec 1710³70.1DiedBishop of Venosa, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Placido Scoppa (Stoppa):
Archbishop Placido Scoppa (Stoppa) C.R. (born , died Dec 1710) Bishop of Venosa

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 327, and Page 410
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1693, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015