Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alderano Cardinal Cibo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1613BornGenoa
6 Mar 164531.6Elevated to Cardinal
24 Apr 164531.7InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santa Pudenziana
24 Apr 165642.7AppointedBishop of Jesi, Italy
30 Jan 166854.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
10 Dec 167158.4ResignedBishop of Jesi, Italy
13 Sep 167764.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
6 Feb 167965.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Palestrina
8 Jan 168066.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
15 Feb 168369.5AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
10 Nov 168774.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
22 Jul 170087.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Jesi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alderano Cibo:
Alderano Cardinal Cibo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Jesi

  • a cardinal for 55.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 6 Mar 1645
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 71
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 22 Apr 2015