Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomeo Castelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1650¹BornPalermo
28 Nov 169545.9AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
30 Nov 169545.9Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
5 Apr 173080.2DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomeo Castelli:
Bishop Bartolomeo Castelli C.R. (born 1650, died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

  • a bishop for 34.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 261, and Page 353
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1695, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015