Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardino Plastina, O.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1645Born
17 Dec 166722.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of the Minims
25 Jan 169448.2AppointedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
31 Jan 169448.2Ordained BishopBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy
16 Feb 169751.2DiedBishop of Oppido Mamertina, Italy

MicroData Summary for Bernardino Plastina
Bishop Bernardino Plastina O.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Oppido Mamertina

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFuscaldi

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 3.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 297
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1694, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast