Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Troili

Deceased

Bishop of Foligno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1636BornMacerata
15 Sep 169861.9AppointedBishop of Foligno, Italy
5 Oct 169861.9Ordained BishopBishop of Foligno, Italy
6 Jul 171275.7DiedBishop of Foligno, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Troili:
Bishop Giulio Troili (born , died ) Bishop of Foligno

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 206
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1698, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015