Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Braschi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sarsina

Titular Archbishop of Nisibis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1657¹BornCesene
1 Jun 169942.4AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
22 Jun 169942.4Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
14 May 171861.3ResignedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
20 Dec 172467.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nisibis
24 Nov 173679.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Sarsina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Braschi:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Braschi (born 1657, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sarsina

  • a bishop for 37.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 290, and Page 346
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1699, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 3 May 2015