Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Girolamo Cardinal Colonna

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Frascati

Archpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Mar 1604Born
30 Aug 162723.4Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
7 Feb 162823.8Elevated to Cardinal
28 Feb 162823.9InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agnese in Agone
1629¹24.7AppointedArchpriest of the Arcibasilica di San Giovanni in Laterano {Saint John Lateran Basilica}
24 Nov 163228.6AppointedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
27 Dec 163228.7Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jan 163328.7Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
27 Jun 163935.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santa Maria in Cosmedin
14 Mar 164439.9AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
12 Dec 164440.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Eustachio
164540.7ResignedArchbishop of Bologna, Italy
23 Sep 165248.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
9 Jun 165349.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Trastevere
21 Apr 165955.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Lorenzo in Lucina
21 Nov 166157.6AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
4 Sep 166662.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Bologna, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Colonna (VIAF: 55205699)
Girolamo Cardinal Colonna (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Bologna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOrsogna, Diocese of Chieti
Ordained PriestSan Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Ordained BishopSant'Egidio in Trastevere, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceDominican Convent of Santa Caterina, Finale Ligure, Diocese of Savona
Buried Place (Original)Dominican Convent of Santa Caterina, Finale Ligure, Diocese of Savona
Buried Place (Current)San Giovanni in Laterano, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
  • a cardinal for 39.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 30 Aug 1627
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 118
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,840
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1632, Number 34
  • op/c1: AT, 6 Sep 2016
  • op/c1: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ob/c2: AT, 20 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Feb 2017