Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eladio Acosta Arteaga, C.I.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe de Antioquia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Apr 1916BornLa América
7 Aug 194933.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Jesus and Mary
6 Mar 197053.9AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
12 Apr 197054.0Ordained BishopBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
18 Jun 198872.2AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe de Antioquia, Colombia
10 Oct 199276.5RetiredArchbishop of Santa Fe de Antioquia, Colombia
30 Jan 201295.8DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe de Antioquia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Eladio Acosta Arteaga:
Archbishop Eladio Acosta Arteaga C.I.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Santa Fe de Antioquia

  • a priest for 62.5 years
  • a bishop for 41.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013