Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Bucaramanga

Archidioecesis Bucaramanguensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 December 1974
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 5,397 (2,084 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle 33 N. 21-16, Bucaramanga, Santander, Colombia
  • Telephone: (7)6424.387; 6425.132
  • Fax: 6421.361

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Bucaramanga
17 December 1952ErectedDiocese of Nueva Pamplona Diocese of Bucaramanga (erected)
Archdiocese of Bucaramanga
14 December 1974ElevatedDiocese of Bucaramanga Archdiocese of Bucaramanga
7 July 1987Territory LostArchdiocese of Bucaramanga Diocese of Málaga-Soatá (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Bucaramanga
1958358,177363,82098.4%66431093,2866135841ap1960
1966565,287569,29799.3%87801673,3849344851ap1967
1970579,998593,99897.6%84581424,0841011,03158ap1971
Archdiocese of Bucaramanga
1976601,605619,19897.2%84411254,8126134067ap1977
1980675,682695,81597.1%85481335,0807239869ap1981
1990832,684858,58697.0%89681575,303310156369ap1991
19991,045,8841,070,13397.7%137682055,1011010661290ap2000
20001,072,0351,096,89697.7%146682145,0091014255290ap2001
20011,104,2141,130,51797.7%148682165,1121013862592ap2002
20021,126,7491,153,58997.7%147652125,3141411563294ap2003
20031,149,2841,176,66097.7%150652155,3452012263694ap2004
20041,168,5251,192,35098.0%143702135,4862412558196ap2005
20121,343,7601,376,25297.6%183612445,50756105574105ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 9 Sep 2013