Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Rafael Sarmiento Peralta

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1914BornBucaramanga
16 Apr 193823.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
17 Dec 195238.0IncardinatedPriest of Bucaramanga, Colombia
26 Oct 196247.9AppointedBishop of Ocaña, Colombia
6 Jan 196348.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ocaña, Colombia
24 Jul 197257.7AppointedBishop of Neiva, Colombia
12 Jan 198570.1AppointedArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
21 Jun 199479.6RetiredArchbishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
25 Apr 200085.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Rafael Sarmiento Peralta:
Archbishop Rafael Sarmiento Peralta (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 May 2014