Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Gallego Pérez

Deceased

Bishop of Cali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1903BornDonmatías
30 Nov 192522.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
3 Feb 195349.8AppointedBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
19 Mar 195350.0Ordained BishopBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
27 Mar 195350.0InstalledBishop of Barranquilla, Colombia
18 Dec 195855.7AppointedBishop of Cali, Colombia
2 Feb 195955.8InstalledBishop of Cali, Colombia
21 May 196057.1DiedBishop of Cali, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Francisco Gallego Pérez:
Bishop Francisco Gallego Pérez (born , died ) Bishop of Cali

  • a priest for 34.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • i/c103: Website of the Diocese, 1 Dec 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013