Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfred Couderc

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viviers, France

Titular Bishop of Bamaccora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 May 1882Born
9 Jun 190624.0Ordained PriestPriest
26 Apr 193754.9AppointedBishop of Viviers, France
4 Jul 193755.0Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers, France
14 Dec 196583.5RetiredBishop of Viviers, France
14 Dec 196583.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Bamaccora
25 Feb 196885.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Viviers, France

MicroData Summary for Alfred Couderc
Bishop Alfred Couderc (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viviers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbas

  • a priest for 61.7 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1937, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017