Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Rémond

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mission de France o Pontigny, France

Titular Bishop of Utimma


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1922Born
25 Mar 195027.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 May 197552.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
6 May 197552.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Utimma
14 Jun 197552.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Utimma
21 Dec 198765.4ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mission de France o Pontigny, France
21 Feb 200986.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mission de France o Pontigny, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Rémond
Bishop Jean Rémond (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mission de France o Pontigny

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCharolles

  • a priest for 58.9 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast