Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ghislain Marie Raoul Suzanne de Rasilly, S.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1943 Born
6 Feb 197127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
20 Jun 200561.9AppointedBishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
7 Aug 200562.0Ordained BishopBishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)
24 Dec 201875.4RetiredBishop of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Ghislain Marie Raoul Suzanne de Rasilly
Bishop Ghislain Marie Raoul Suzanne de Rasilly S.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Wallis et Futuna

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJuvardeil, Diocese of Angers, France
Ordained PriestNotre-Dame des Anges, Chapel, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France
Ordained BishopOutside of, Cathedral, Mata`utu, ìle Wallis, Diocese of Wallis et Futuna, Wallis and Futuna

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Wallis et Futuna.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 182, Number 14,961
  • op/c1/loc: AJ, 3 Jul 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 24 Dec 2018

Quantcast