Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georges-Louis Mercier, M. Afr. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Laghouat


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Aug 1902BornCarignan, France
2 Feb 192825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of Africa (White Fathers)
13 Jun 194138.8AppointedPrefect of Ghardaïa nel Sahara, Algeria
21 Jun 194845.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Celerina
21 Jun 194845.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ghardaïa nel Sahara, Algeria
8 Dec 194846.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Celerina
14 Sep 195553.1AppointedBishop of Laghouat, Algeria
11 Jan 196865.4ResignedBishop of Laghouat, Algeria
11 Jan 196865.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Furnos Minor
13 Oct 197674.1ResignedTitular Bishop of Furnos Minor
27 Aug 199189.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Laghouat, Algeria

MicroData Summary for Georges-Louis Mercier:
Bishop Georges-Louis Mercier M. Afr. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Laghouat

  • a priest for 63.5 years
  • a bishop for 42.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1948, Number 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015