Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guy Alexis Herbulot

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1925Born
29 Jun 195025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Reims, France
20 Jun 197449.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Reims, France
20 Jun 197449.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Obbi
8 Sep 197449.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Obbi
12 May 197853.1AppointedBishop of Corbeil, France
15 Apr 200075.1RetiredBishop of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France
1 Aug 202196.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes, France

MicroData Summary for Guy Alexis Herbulot
Bishop Guy Alexis Herbulot (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Evry-Corbeil-Essonnes

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Menges
Ordained BishopCathedral, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims
Death PlaceSaint-Jean-Baptiste de la Salle, Retreat House, Athis-Mons

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 46.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 25, Number 1,436
  • d: CB, 2 Aug 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 3 Aug 2021

Quantcast