Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René-Fernand-Eugène Fourrey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Belley


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1901BornBrienon-sur-Armançon
26 Oct 192423.5Ordained PriestPriest
2 Jun 195554.1AppointedBishop of Belley, France
9 Aug 195554.3Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
17 May 197574.0RetiredBishop of Belley, France
12 Feb 198280.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Belley, France

MicroData Summary for René-Fernand-Eugène Fourrey:
Bishop René-Fernand-Eugène Fourrey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Belley

  • a priest for 57.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013